IN HB1065 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a person, including an individual, a corporation, and a governmental entity, from adopting or enforcing a policy or rule that prohibits or has the effect of prohibiting an employee of the person, including a contract employee, from legally possessing a firearm or ammunition that is locked in the trunk of the employee's vehicle, kept in the glove compartment of the employee's locked vehicle, or stored out of sight in the employee's locked vehicle while the vehicle is in or on the person's property, unless the firearm or ammunition requires a certain federal license to possess. Exempts possession of a firearm or ammunition: (1) on school property, on property used by a school for a school function, or on a school bus; (2) on certain child care and shelter facility property; (3) on penal facility property; (4) in violation of federal law; (5) on property belonging to an approved postsecondary educational institution; (6) on the property of a domestic violence shelter; (7) at a person's residence; (8) on the property of a person that is subject to the United States Department of Homeland Security's Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards and licensed by the United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission; (9) on property owned by a public utility that generates and transmits electric power or a department of public utilities; and (10) in an employee's personal vehicle if the employee is a direct support professional who uses the employee's personal vehicle while transporting an individual with developmental disabilities. Provides that a court does not have jurisdiction over an action that: (1) is brought against an employer who is in compliance with the prohibition against adoption or enforcement of a policy or rule that prohibits the possession of a firearm in a locked vehicle; and (2) is brought to recover for any injury or damage resulting from the employer's compliance. Authorizes a person harmed by a violation to bring a civil action for damages, costs, attorney's fees, and injunctive relief to remedy a violation. Prohibits the state, a political subdivision, or any other person from prohibiting or restricting the lawful possession, transfer, sale, transportation, storage, display, or use of firearms or ammunition during a declared disaster emergency, energy emergency, or local disaster emergency, subject to exceptions that apply to the prohibition against adoption or enforcement of a policy or rule that prohibits the possession of a firearm in a locked vehicle. Repeals provisions that allow certain political subdivisions to adopt emergency ordinances to regulate firearms if a local disaster emergency has been declared. Deletes an outdated reference.
Title
Various provisions concerning firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 90 | |
2010-03-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-04 | Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 272: Yeas 41, Nays 9 | |
2010-03-04 | Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 294: Yeas 75, Nays 20 | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended | |
2010-03-04 | Conference committee report 2 : filed in the House | |
2010-03-03 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2010-03-01 | Senate advisors appointed: Steele, M. Young, R. Young and Lewis | |
2010-03-01 | Senate conferee appointed: Nugent and Hume | |
2010-02-25 | House advisors appointed: VanHaaften, Grubb, Torr and Murphy | |
2010-02-25 | House conferees appointed: Bischoff and Koch | |
2010-02-25 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2010-02-22 | Senator Landske added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-22 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2010-02-22 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 188: Yeas 41 and Nays 9 | |
2010-02-18 | Amendment 8 (Simpson), failed; Roll Call 175: Yeas 15, Nays 33 | |
2010-02-18 | Amendment 9 (Broden), failed; Division of the Senate: Yeas 16, Nays 31 | |
2010-02-18 | Amendment 2 (Walker), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-18 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-16 | Senators M. Young and Kruse added as cosponsors | |
2010-02-11 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-01 | Senators Hume and R. Young added as cosponsors | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Steele added as second sponsor | |
2010-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2010-01-26 | Senate sponsor: Senator Nugent | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-01-26 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 69: Yeas 76, Nays 21 | |
2010-01-25 | Amendment 1 (C. Brown), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-25 | Amendment 9 (DeLaney), failed; Roll Call 58: Yeas 16, Nays 76 | |
2010-01-25 | Amendment 3 (DeLaney), failed; Roll Call 57: Yeas 22, Nays 72 | |
2010-01-25 | Amendment 2 (Cheatham), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-25 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-21 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-13 | Representatives VanHaaften, Reske and Murphy added as coauthors | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Representative Bischoff |