IN HB1064 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Public Law 123
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Courts and magistrates. Adds a superior court in Hamilton County. Provides that the first judge of Hamilton superior court No. 7 shall: (1) be elected at the November 2022 general election; (2) take office January 1, 2023; and (3) serve a term of six years. Allows the judges of the Decatur circuit and superior courts to jointly appoint a magistrate to serve the Decatur County courts. Allows the judges of the Huntington circuit and superior courts to jointly appoint a magistrate to serve the Huntington County courts. Allows the judge of the Lake superior court division No. 4 to appoint a magistrate to serve the Lake superior court division No. 4. Allows the Marion County superior courts to appoint 27 full-time magistrates after December 31, 2021, not more than 14 of whom may be from the same political party. Removes the sixth circuit court in Delaware County. Provides a full-time magistrate for Hancock County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts and magistrates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 78 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HousePublic Law 123
2021-04-26HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-22SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-08HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 380: yeas 78, nays 7
2021-04-06HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-03-31SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-03-30SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 285: yeas 50, nays 0
2021-03-29SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-25SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-16SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-03-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2021-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-10HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-09HouseRepresentative Porter added as coauthor
2021-02-09HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Crider, Zay, Walker K
2021-02-09HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 99: yeas 68, nays 24
2021-02-08HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseReferred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2021-01-14HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-01-04HouseCoauthored by Representatives Eberhart and Jeter
2021-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Cherry

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1064/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/f/a/b3fa7419/HB1064.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/4/8/dd482416/HB1064.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/7/7/b17765fa/HB1064.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/3/5/42355b45/HB1064.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/b/e/c9becafa/HB1064.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/f/8/6af88fcb/HB1064.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/c/1/4cc12530/HB1064.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/a/3/3da3e3bb/HB1064.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/7/f/b27fccf1/HB1064.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/e/7/aee7a043/HB1064.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/3/5/4e352832/HB1064.06.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/3/1/0231baef/HB1064.03.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/5/4/21544897/HB1064.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/4/0/fc40fb75/HB1064.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/4/0/c840fbc3/HB1064.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/1/a/4c1a0336/HB1064.02.COMH.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/d/f/29df30d7/HB1064.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/f/1/e9f17a80/HB1064.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/5/e/2f5e2d04/HB1064.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/b/e/efbe4fe6/HB1064.03.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/c/9/f4c9244a/HB1064.04.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/3/3/4a33f188/HB1064.04.COMS.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/0/7/d3074814/HB1064.05.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/9/e/8b9e1605/HB1064.05.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/8/f/038f9410/HB1064.05.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/1/c/ea1c1875/HB1064.05.COMS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/a/4/40a47df2/HB1064.06.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/b/6/eeb64e68/HB1064.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/3/2/913299a8/HB1064.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/e/b/b7eb8b76/HB1064.99_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/3/c/483c344f/HB1064.03.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/c/f/37cfe71a/HB1064.04.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/9/8/7398172a/HB1064.285_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/1/c/341c3068/HB1064.380_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback