IN HB1064 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Senator Messmer added as cosponsor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Ivy Tech Community College. Establishes the Ivy Tech Community College public safety officer scholarship program. Provides that a public safety officer may be eligible for a scholarship for educational costs of completing a certificate program or associate degree program at Ivy Tech Community College. Establishes the Ivy Tech public safety scholarship fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ivy Tech Community College. Establishes the Ivy Tech Community College public safety officer scholarship program. Provides that a public safety officer may be eligible for a scholarship for educational costs of completing a certificate program or associate degree program at Ivy Tech Community College. Establishes the Ivy Tech public safety scholarship fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - House - Third reading (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateSenator Messmer added as cosponsor
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-30HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-29HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Crider, Perfect and Koch
2019-01-29HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 56: yeas 84, nays 14
2019-01-28HouseRepresentatives May and Macer added as coauthors
2019-01-28HouseAmendment #2 (Frye R) prevailed; voice vote
2019-01-28HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-01-24HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-07HouseRepresentative Lindauer added as coauthor
2019-01-03HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2019-01-03HouseAuthored by Representative Frye R

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback