IN HB1063 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 44
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School safety equipment. Adds definition of a "bleeding control kit". Provides that, subject to an appropriation by the general assembly or a donation, each school corporation and charter school shall develop and implement a Stop the Bleed program (program). Provides that the department of education, in collaboration with the department of homeland security, shall develop and provide training for the use of bleeding control kits. Provides that, in all matters relating to the program, school corporation or charter school personnel are immune from civil liability for any act done or omitted in the use of a bleeding control kit unless the action constitutes gross negligence or willful or wanton misconduct. Requires a school's safety plan to include the location of bleeding control kits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School safety equipment. Adds definition of a "bleeding control kit". Provides that, subject to an appropriation by the general assembly or a donation, each school corporation and charter school shall develop and implement a Stop the Bleed program (program). Provides that the department of education, in collaboration with the department of homeland security, shall develop and provide training for the use of bleeding control kits. Provides that, in all matters relating to the program, school corporation or charter school personnel are immune from civil liability for any act done or omitted in the use of a bleeding control kit unless the action constitutes gross negligence or willful or wanton misconduct. Requires a school's safety plan to include the location of bleeding control kits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HousePublic Law 44
2019-04-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-08HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 405: yeas 89, nays 0
2019-04-03HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-03-20SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-03-19SenateSenator Alting added as cosponsor
2019-03-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 282: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-03-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-07SenateSenator Kruse added as cosponsor
2019-03-07SenateSenator Crane added as cosponsor
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-01-25HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-24HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Crider, Raatz and Koch
2019-01-24HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 34: yeas 99, nays 0
2019-01-22HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-15HouseRepresentatives Judy and Macer added as coauthors
2019-01-03HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2019-01-03HouseCoauthored by Representative Barrett
2019-01-03HouseAuthored by Representative Frye R

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1063/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/5/a/4d5a0785/HB1063.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/f/d/dffdeba7/HB1063.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/9/4/ca94eb7a/HB1063.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/0/2/4102d459/HB1063.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/4/4/7144e219/HB1063.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/2/0/cc20fd8f/HB1063.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/c/f/27cf97b2/HB1063.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/3/4/9334d851/HB1063.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/2/b/4c2b7b6a/HB1063.34.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/4/5/6d455094/HB1063.02.COMH.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/9/e/029eb7e1/HB1063.282.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/8/e/138e7e2a/HB1063.405.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback