IN HB1063 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that certain government buildings be built to achieve maximum energy efficiency to the extent this can be accomplished on a cost effective basis, considering construction and operating costs over the life cycle of the building. Requires the department of administration to develop design standards that require analysis of cost effectiveness, and provides that energy efficiency may be demonstrated through design that achieves a certain energy efficiency rating. Requires that certain government buildings be designed, renovated, or reconstructed to achieve maximum energy efficiency to the extent this can be accomplished on a cost effective basis, considering construction and operating costs over the life cycle of the building. Provides that the design, renovation, or reconstruction may be based on certain energy efficiency rating systems. Excepts political subdivisions and school corporations from the renovation requirements. Requires in the determination of cost effectiveness that value be afforded to the historic or aesthetic qualities of the government building and to the availability of local materials. Provides that Indiana hardwood lumber may be considered for use as a local source material in any project in which the use of Indiana hardwood lumber is practicable. Recognizes a 2006 timberland study.
Title
Energy efficient buildings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-11 | Senators Errington and Breaux added as cosponsors | |
2010-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Energy and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-01-28 | Senate sponsors: Senators Gard and Tallian | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-01-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 87: Yeas 51, Nays 47 | |
2010-01-25 | Representative Candelaria Reardon added as coauthor | |
2010-01-21 | Amendment 1 (Pierce), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-21 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-20 | Representative Harris added as coauthor | |
2010-01-19 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Representative Pierce |