IN HB1062 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Public Law 113
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Public Law 113
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation of cemeteries. Defines "certificate of burial rights" for purposes of the cemetery law. Replaces references to other instruments issued upon the purchase of burial rights with the term. Provides that before entering into a sales contract with a consumer, an owner of a cemetery must provide a written statement including a price range of all commodities and services available for purchase. Specifies that the schedule of fees and the fees charged in connection with the installation or use of commodities in a cemetery must be consistent with the statement provided to a consumer. Prohibits the preinstallation of a vault. Increases the maximum civil penalty for a violation of the cemetery association law from $1,000 to $5,000. Permits a city or town, county, and township to appoint a cemetery caretaker to control and manage cemeteries in the entity's care. Establishes requirements for a city or town to appoint a cemetery caretaker through a proposed ordinance. Requires a city or town to review the status of the control and management of a cemetery for which it is responsible at least once every 10 years.
Title
Regulation of cemeteries.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Public Law 113 |
2022-03-14 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 320: yeas 80, nays 10 |
2022-03-02 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 280: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second sponsor |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-20 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Brown L |
2022-01-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 41: yeas 86, nays 5 |
2022-01-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-13 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development |
2022-01-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative Clere |
2022-01-04 | House | Authored by Representative Zent |