IN HB1061 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Magistrates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Magistrates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 100
2013-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-17HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-16HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 509: yeas 92, nays 0
2013-03-28SenateSenator Skinner added as cosponsor
2013-03-28SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2013-03-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 330: yeas 49 and nays 0
2013-03-26SenateAmendment 1 (Zakas), prevailed; voice vote
2013-03-26SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-03-21SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-03-14SenateCommittee report: do pass, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2013-03-07SenateSenator Schneider added as cosponsor
2013-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2013-02-21HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Becker
2013-02-21HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-02-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 192: yeas 94, nays 0
2013-02-20HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-14HouseRepresentative Speedy added as coauthor
2013-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2013-02-07HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-02-05HouseRepresentative Crouch added as coauthor
2013-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2013-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Bacon

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback