IN HB1058 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Permits two or more school corporations to publish notices, hold public hearings, and take final action for the adoption of property tax levies, property tax rates, and a budget for the reorganized school corporation after the voters approve a plan of reorganization in a general election. Provides that a conversion charter school must publish its estimated annual budget for the ensuing year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption of budget for reorganized school.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Porter), prevailed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-06 Signed by the Governor
2012-02-29 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-02-28 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-02-27 Signed by the Speaker
2012-02-23 Returned to the House without amendments
2012-02-23 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 236: yeas 48 and nays 1
2012-02-21 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-02-16 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-02-09 Senator Kruse added as cosponsor
2012-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2012-01-26 Senate sponsors: Senators Boots and Broden
2012-01-26 Referred to the Senate
2012-01-26 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 67: yeas 97, nays 0
2012-01-25 Amendment 1 (Porter), prevailed; Roll Call 56: yeas 92, nays 3
2012-01-25 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-01-13 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-01-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2012-01-09 Coauthored by Representative Grubb
2012-01-09 Authored by Representative Baird

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback