IN HB1057 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Public Law 25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Public Law 25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Vanderburgh County magistrates. Allows the judge of the Vanderburgh circuit court to appoint an additional magistrate to serve the Vanderburgh circuit court. Allows the judges of the Vanderburgh superior court to jointly appoint an additional magistrate to serve the Vanderburgh superior court.
Title
Vanderburgh County magistrates. Allows the judge of the Vanderburgh circuit court to appoint an additional magistrate to serve the Vanderburgh circuit court. Allows the judges of the Vanderburgh superior court to jointly appoint an additional magistrate to serve the Vanderburgh superior court.
Sponsors
Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D] | Rep. Holli Sullivan [R] | Rep. Matt Hostettler [R] |
Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Public Law 25 |
2019-04-10 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-03-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 280: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as second sponsor |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-12 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Becker |
2019-02-12 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 168: yeas 87, nays 0 |
2019-02-11 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2019-01-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-01-03 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Hatfield, Sullivan and Hostettler |
2019-01-03 | House | Authored by Representative McNamara |