IN HB1057 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pretrial diversion. Provides that the initial user fee amount for a diversion agreement involving a misdemeanor is $50. Provides that the initial user fee amount for a diversion agreement involving a felony is $75. Allows a court to impose on a person an additional program fee or cost that is reasonably related to the person's rehabilitation. Prohibits a monthly user fee from being collected beyond the maximum length of a possible sentence. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Pretrial diversion. Provides that the initial user fee amount for a diversion agreement involving a misdemeanor is $50. Provides that the initial user fee amount for a diversion agreement involving a felony is $75. Allows a court to impose on a person an additional program fee or cost that is reasonably related to the person's rehabilitation. Prohibits a monthly user fee from being collected beyond the maximum length of a possible sentence. Makes conforming amendments.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Thomas Washburne [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Matt Pierce [D] |
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Public Law 24 |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 210: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-30 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Young M, Bray and Boots |
2018-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 79: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2018-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-22 | House | Representative Pierce added as coauthor |
2018-01-22 | House | Representatives Washburne and McNamara added as coauthors |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2018-01-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2018-01-03 | House | Authored by Representative Steuerwald |