IN HB1056 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Student transfers. Provides that a student may transfer to a school corporation if the student's parent is an employee of the school corporation and the school corporation has the capacity to accept the student. Provides that an elementary school student who attended an accredited nonpublic elementary school in the attendance area of a school corporation in which the student does not have legal settlement may attend a high school in the school corporation if the school corporation: (1) has the capacity to accept the student and the majority of the students in the same grade as the transferring student at

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student transfers. Provides that a student may transfer to a school corporation if the student's parent is an employee of the school corporation and the school corporation has the capacity to accept the student. Provides that an elementary school student who attended an accredited nonpublic elementary school in the attendance area of a school corporation in which the student does not have legal settlement may attend a high school in the school corporation if the school corporation: (1) has the capacity to accept the student and the majority of the students in the same grade as the transferring student at

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-15HousePublic Law 17
2015-04-15HouseSigned by the Governor
2015-04-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-07SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-03-31HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-03-27SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2015-03-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 335: yeas 50, nays 0
2015-03-24SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-23SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2015-03-19SenateSenator Rogers added as cosponsor
2015-03-19SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-03-12SenateSenator Kruse added as second sponsor
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to committee on Education & Career Development
2015-01-27HouseSenator Charbonneau added first sponsor
2015-01-26HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-01-26HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 21: yeas 96, nays 0
2015-01-22HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-20HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-15HouseRepresentative Cook added as coauthor
2015-01-15HouseRepresentative Smith, V. added as coauthor
2015-01-14HouseRepresentative Austin added as coauthor
2015-01-06HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Education
2015-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Soliday

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1056/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/0/d/9a0dbd9e/HB1056.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/1/a/fb1ab715/HB1056.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/4/a/5c4a9de8/HB1056.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/b/b/84bb6a9c/HB1056.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/f/4/c1f4b94a/HB1056.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/f/b/80fb3c69/HB1056.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/4/2/4742346b/HB1056.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/4/f/c44fa12b/HB1056.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/f/a/2afa41ea/HB1056.21.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/b/d/48bd1324/HB1056.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/a/7/6da7da4a/HB1056.335.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback