IN HB1056 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 99
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 99
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Probate and trust administration.
Title
Probate and trust administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 99 |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 514: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 299: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Amendment 2 (Steele), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reread second time: amended and ordered engrossed |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senator Broden added as cosponsor |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as second sponsor |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-22 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Steele |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-01-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 16: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2013-01-22 | House | Representative Dvorak added as coauthor |
2013-01-17 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-15 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative McMillin |