IN HB1054 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a restaurant located not more than 700 feet (instead of 500 feet) from a historic district is eligible for a permit to sell alcoholic beverages without regard to the permit quota. Provides that not more than ten permits issued to restaurants within or not more than 700 feet from a historic district may be active at any time. Provides for a cultural center permit for a city with an indoor theater listed on the National Register of Historic Places and with a population of more than 200,000 but less than 300,000. Specifies that the 30,000 barrel production limitation for small Indiana breweries does not apply to the manufacture of beer for sale or distribution outside Indiana. Provides that a small Indiana brewery may sell the brewery's beer on Sunday at any address for which the brewer holds a brewer's permit if the address is located within the same city boundaries in which the beer was manufactured. (Current law provides that a small Indiana brewery may sell the brewer's beer only at the address for which the brewer's permit was issued.) Provides that a lease and contract concerning the lease of: (1) federally owned land under the control and management of the department of natural resources may permit the retail sale of alcoholic beverages for consumption on the licensed premises of a public golf course located on Brookville Reservoir; and (2) state owned land under the control and management of the department of natural resources may permit the retail sale of alcoholic beverages for consumption on the licensed premises of a pavilion located within Indiana Dunes State Park; if the lessee or concessionaire applies for and secures the necessary alcohol permits. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Alcoholic beverage matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 81 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-06 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-05 | Representative McMillin added as coauthor | |
2012-03-05 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 329: yeas 81, nays 7 | |
2012-02-21 | Senator Tallian added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-21 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 218: yeas 43 and nays 7 | |
2012-02-20 | Senator Taylor added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-20 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-16 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2012-01-31 | Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau, Merritt and Wyss | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 148: yeas 93, nays 0 | |
2012-01-30 | Representative GiaQuinta added as coauthor | |
2012-01-30 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Soliday |