IN HB1053 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-19)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Public Law 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Disabled Hoosier veteran license plate. Requires the bureau of motor vehicles (bureau) to redesign the disabled Hoosier veteran license plate. Specifies that a disabled Hoosier veteran license plate must consist of the following elements: (1) The display of an emblem denoting the branch of service in which the veteran served. (2) A depiction of a wheelchair to indicate the disabled status of the veteran. (3) The words "Disabled Hoosier Veteran" at the bottom of the license plate. (4) Identification numerals with consecutive numbers or letters, or both, to properly identify the vehicle. (5) Any other information the bureau considers necessary. Makes conforming technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disabled Hoosier veteran license plate. Requires the bureau of motor vehicles (bureau) to redesign the disabled Hoosier veteran license plate. Specifies that a disabled Hoosier veteran license plate must consist of the following elements: (1) The display of an emblem denoting the branch of service in which the veteran served. (2) A depiction of a wheelchair to indicate the disabled status of the veteran. (3) The words "Disabled Hoosier Veteran" at the bottom of the license plate. (4) Identification numerals with consecutive numbers or letters, or both, to properly identify the vehicle. (5) Any other information the bureau considers necessary. Makes conforming technical amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HousePublic Law 24
2019-04-10HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-01SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-03-28HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-03-26SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2019-03-25SenateSenator Crane added as cosponsor
2019-03-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 305: yeas 46, nays 0
2019-03-21SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-21SenateSenator Glick added as cosponsor
2019-03-21SenateSenator Tomes added as second sponsor
2019-03-21SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-19SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-05HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Messmer
2019-02-05HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 97: yeas 95, nays 0
2019-02-04HouseRepresentatives Bosma, Abbott D, Austin, Bacon, Bauer, Burton, Candelaria Reardon, Carbaugh, Cherry, Chyung, Cook, DeVon, Eberhart, Ellington, Engleman, Errington, Fleming, Forestal, GiaQuinta, Goodin, Goodrich, Gutwein, Hamilton, Harris, Hatfield, Heaton, Hostettler, Jackson, Kirchhofer, Klinker, Lauer, Lindauer, Lucas, Mahan, Manning, May, Miller, Morris, Moseley, Negele, Pressel, Pryor, Schaibley, Stutzman, Summers, Thompson, Torr, Wright added as coauthors
2019-02-04HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2019-02-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-03HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2019-01-03HouseCoauthored by Representatives Bartels, Zent and Judy
2019-01-03HouseAuthored by Representative McNamara

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1053/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/f/8/b1f8cadd/HB1053.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/2/e/822e75fd/HB1053.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/d/0/14d085b5/HB1053.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/f/d/21fdd50b/HB1053.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/b/8/b4b88f3d/HB1053.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/3/7/2d376b46/HB1053.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/9/3/9d93beb4/HB1053.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/a/9/76a955d0/HB1053.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/8/f/258f5a79/HB1053.97.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/9/3/2893cb81/HB1053.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/b/c/64bc9b6a/HB1053.305.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback