IN HB1053 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation of packaging materials. Amends the home rule statute to prohibit a local government unit from: (1) regulating: (A) certain activities with respect to reusable or disposable auxiliary containers designed for one time use or for transporting merchandise or food from food or retail facilities (auxiliary containers); or (B) a manufacturer of, a distributor of, or a food or retail facility that sells, provides, or otherwise makes use of, auxiliary containers, in connection with certain activities involving auxiliary containers; or (2) imposing any prohibition, restriction, fee, or tax with respect to auxiliary containers or to a manufacturer of, a distributor
Title
Regulation of packaging materials. Amends the home rule statute to prohibit a local government unit from: (1) regulating: (A) certain activities with respect to reusable or disposable auxiliary containers designed for one time use or for transporting merchandise or food from food or retail facilities (auxiliary containers); or (B) a manufacturer of, a distributor of, or a food or retail facility that sells, provides, or otherwise makes use of, auxiliary containers, in connection with certain activities involving auxiliary containers; or (2) imposing any prohibition, restriction, fee, or tax with respect to auxiliary containers or to a manufacturer of, a distributor
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] | Rep. Jim Lucas [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] |
Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Clyde Perfect [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Stoops) failed (Y: 9 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 61 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Stoops) failed (Y: 9 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 61 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Public Law 150 |
2016-03-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 202: yeas 38, nays 12 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senator Perfect added as cosponsor |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Stoops) failed; Roll Call 184: yeas 9, nays 38 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senator Ford added as cosponsor |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as third sponsor |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senator Steele added as sponsor |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senator Houchin removed as sponsor |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-01-25 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Houchin and Becker |
2016-01-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 43: yeas 61, nays 32 |
2016-01-21 | House | Amendment #1 (Pierce) failed; voice vote |
2016-01-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-19 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-11 | House | Representative Lucas added as coauthor |
2016-01-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2016-01-05 | House | Authored by Representative Bacon |