IN HB1051 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Sunday sales of alcoholic beverages for carryout. Allows the following to sell alcoholic beverages for carryout on Sunday from noon until 8 p.m.: (1) A package liquor store, grocery store, convenience store, or drug store. (2) A restaurant that satisfies the requirements to sell carryout. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the alcohol code revision commission.)
Title
Sunday sales of alcoholic beverages for carryout. Allows the following to sell alcoholic beverages for carryout on Sunday from noon until 8 p.m.: (1) A package liquor store, grocery store, convenience store, or drug store. (2) A restaurant that satisfies the requirements to sell carryout. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the alcohol code revision commission.)
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Smaltz [R] | Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] | Rep. David Ober [R] | Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D] |
Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-23 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Alting |
2018-01-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 45: yeas 87, nays 10 |
2018-01-22 | House | Amendment #2 (Pierce) failed; voice vote |
2018-01-22 | House | Amendment #1 (DeLaney) motion withdrawn |
2018-01-22 | House | Amendment #3 (DeLaney) motion withdrawn |
2018-01-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-18 | House | Representative Austin added as coauthor |
2018-01-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-08 | House | Representatives GiaQuinta and Ober added as coauthors |
2018-01-03 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2018-01-03 | House | Authored by Representative Smaltz |