IN HB1051 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-17 - First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-17 - First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Versailles Lake task force (task force) to examine topics concerning Versailles Lake and the public water supply of surrounding communities. Requires the task force to issue a final report before September 1, 2012.
Title
Versailles Lake task force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-15 | Senate sponsors: Senators Smith and Nugent | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-15 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 163: yeas 96, nays 0 | |
2011-02-14 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-10 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-08 | Representative Cheatham added as coauthor | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Representative R. Frye |