IN HB1048 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Public Law 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Public Law 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Technical corrections. Addresses technical errors in the Indiana Code, including spelling, tabulation, formatting, grammatical, and cross-reference issues. Makes conforming amendments to align the style of population parameter wording. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the code revision commission.)
Title
Technical corrections.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Engleman [R] | Rep. Craig Snow [R] | Rep. Pat Boy [D] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] |
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Mike Gaskill [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | Public Law 11 |
2023-04-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-03-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 215: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-01-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 28: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2023-01-24 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Freeman and Gaskill |
2023-01-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-01-19 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Engleman |
2023-01-09 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Snow, Boy, DeLaney |