IN HB1047 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the division to: (1) conduct a study on the number and types of audits and surveys required of entities providing services for which the division pays; and (2) evaluate whether certain providers that have achieved national accreditation should be considered by the division to be accredited for purposes of surveys conducted by state agencies; and to report back concerning the study to the developmental disabilities commission and the health finance commission by September 1, 2011.
Title
Audit and survey requirement s of providers study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 05/10/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 176 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-26 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 655: yeas 72, nays 0 | |
2011-04-12 | Senator Buck added as second sponsor | |
2011-04-12 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-12 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 340: yeas 49 and nays 0 | |
2011-04-07 | Amendment 4 (Lawson), prevailed; | |
2011-04-07 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-05 | Senator Simpson added as cosponsor | |
2011-03-31 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2011-01-25 | Senate sponsor: Senator Lawson | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-01-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 25: yeas 97, nays 0 | |
2011-01-24 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-01-05 | Coauthored by Representative Klinker | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Representative Crouch |