IN HB1046 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a 50% property tax deduction to a residential builder for a single family residence, townhouse, or condominium that has never been occupied. Specifies that the deduction terminates when title to the structure is transferred to the homeowner. Provides that the deduction applies for one assessment date for which the structure is assessed as partially completed and not more than three assessment dates for which the structure is assessed as fully completed. Provides that a residential builder may not claim deductions for more than three residences in Indiana per assessment date.
Title
Property tax deduction for new unsold residences.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Cheatham [D] | Rep. Robert Cherry [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Suzanne Crouch [R] |
Rep. Robert Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Pryor), failed (Y: 36 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Pryor), failed (Y: 36 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 175 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-26 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 653: yeas 57, nays 6 | |
2011-03-22 | Senator Holdman added as cosponsor | |
2011-03-22 | Senators Alting and Zakas added as cosponsors | |
2011-03-22 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 279: yeas 43 and nays 5 | |
2011-03-21 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-03-14 | Senator Broden added as cosponsor | |
2011-03-14 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-22 | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-21 | Senate sponsors: Senators Hershman, Becker and Banks | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 207: yeas 78, nays 20 | |
2011-02-17 | Amendment 1 (Pryor), failed; Roll Call 187: yeas 36, nays 59 | |
2011-02-17 | Amendment 2 (Crouch), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-02-17 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-15 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-14 | Representatives Clere and Cherry added as coauthors | |
2011-02-14 | House Rule 106.1 suspended | |
2011-02-10 | Representative Morris added as coauthor | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-01-05 | Coauthored by Representative Cheatham | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Representative Crouch |