IN HB1045 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Public Law 47
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Public Law 47
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
529 college savings accounts. Increases the maximum amount of the annual credit against adjusted gross income to which a taxpayer is entitled for a contribution to a college choice 529 education savings plan.
Title
529 college savings accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Public Law 47 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 307: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2022-02-28 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senator Baldwin added as cosponsor |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 230: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senator Crane added as cosponsor |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senator Boehnlein added as cosponsor |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second sponsor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2022-01-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-18 | House | Representatives Snow C, Smaltz, Carbaugh, Klinker added as coauthors |
2022-01-18 | House | Rule 105.2 suspended |
2022-01-18 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Holdman |
2022-01-18 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 21: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2022-01-13 | House | Amendment #2 (Porter) ruled out of order |
2022-01-13 | House | Amendment #1 (Porter) ruled out of order |
2022-01-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-10 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-01-04 | House | Authored by Representative Heine |