IN HB1045 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-5)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 97
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Honor and Remember flag. Allows the Honor and Remember flag to be displayed at each state office building, the Indiana veterans' cemetery, and each veterans cemetery managed by the Indiana department of veterans' affairs. Provides that the Honor and Remember flag may be annually displayed during the month of May. Allows the Honor and Remember flag to be displayed at any time by certain entities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honor and Remember flag.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 97
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-11SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 387: yeas 49, nays 0
2020-03-11HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 381: yeas 94, nays 0
2020-03-11SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-11HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Donato and Niezgodski
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Glick and Mrvan
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Judy, Frye R, Chyung and Moseley
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Abbott and Macer
2020-03-04HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2020-03-04HouseMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateSenators Crane and Spartz added as cosponsors
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 277: yeas 50, nays 0
2020-03-02SenateSenator Randolph added as second sponsor
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-04HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-02-03HouseRepresentatives Barrett, Campbell, Cherry, Clere, DeLaney, DeVon, Engleman, Errington, Gutwein, Heaton, Lauer, Manning, McNamara, Negele, Prescott, Saunders, Smaltz, Thompson added as coauthors
2020-02-03HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2020-02-03HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Glick
2020-02-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 155: yeas 94, nays 0
2020-01-30HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-28HouseRepresentative Zent added as coauthor
2020-01-28HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2020-01-28HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-16HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2020-01-16HouseCoauthored by Representatives Frye R, Stutzman, GiaQuinta
2020-01-16HouseAuthored by Representative Abbott

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1045/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/f/a/b4faf8e5/HB1045.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/3/d/5d3dd86c/HB1045.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/6/4/fa641bd8/HB1045.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/6/9/696931b5/HB1045.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/7/3/f773d561/HB1045.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/e/a/61ea4458/HB1045.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/9/6/8d96353a/HB1045.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/6/4/a56459a8/HB1045.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/a/3/dfa3c170/HB1045.155_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/8/3/2883beef/HB1045.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/e/7/61e7a290/HB1045.277_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/f/1/40f1bc24/HB1045.381_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/9/6/e9964181/HB1045.387_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback