IN HB1044 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Public Law 254
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Food and beverage taxes. Authorizes the fiscal body of the town of Rockville to adopt a town food and beverage tax. Provides that the tax rate may not exceed 1%. Specifies the purposes for which the Rockville food and beverage tax may be used. Authorizes the fiscal body of Orange County to adopt a food and beverage tax of not more than 1%. Specifies the permissible uses of the tax revenue. Urges the legislative council to assign to a study committee the topic of whether a uniform food and beverage tax should be enacted into law to allow local governments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food and beverage taxes. Authorizes the fiscal body of the town of Rockville to adopt a town food and beverage tax. Provides that the tax rate may not exceed 1%. Specifies the purposes for which the Rockville food and beverage tax may be used. Authorizes the fiscal body of Orange County to adopt a food and beverage tax of not more than 1%. Specifies the permissible uses of the tax revenue. Urges the legislative council to assign to a study committee the topic of whether a uniform food and beverage tax should be enacted into law to allow local governments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 51 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12HousePublic Law 254
2015-05-12HouseBill Became Law on 8th Day Without Signature
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-28SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 520: yeas 35, nays 13
2015-04-27HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 536: yeas 51, nays 44
2015-04-20SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Waltz, Randolph and Ford
2015-04-20SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Boots and Broden
2015-04-16HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Price, Thompson and Pryor
2015-04-16HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Morrison and DeLaney
2015-04-14HouseMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-14HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2015-04-14SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2015-04-13SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 416: yeas 33, nays 17
2015-04-07SenateAmendment #1 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-07SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-03-26SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-25SenateFirst Reading: Referred to committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2015-02-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-23HouseSenator Ford added as second sponsor
2015-02-23HouseSenator Boots added as sponsor
2015-02-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 206: yeas 57, nays 39
2015-02-19HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as coauthor
2015-02-19HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-17HouseRepresentative Price added as coauthor
2015-02-17HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-06HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2015-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Morrison

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1044/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/b/c/f4bc4ac6/HB1044.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/3/0/4030c590/HB1044.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/f/3/ccf3bde1/HB1044.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/2/9/8629007a/HB1044.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/6/7/3867c6a3/HB1044.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/2/3/9c23cd5e/HB1044.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/d/0/3fd0eb8d/HB1044.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/c/7/c1c7fd98/HB1044.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/d/8/f0d888fc/HB1044.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/1/c/c51c8e59/HB1044.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/5/7/ad57717d/HB1044.206.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/1/f/591fe09c/HB1044.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/7/c/8e7c7fbf/HB1044.416.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/a/1/04a116a1/HB1044.536.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/8/c/ea8c9d3a/HB1044.520.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback