IN HB1041 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Veto overridden by the Senate; Roll Call 382: yeas 32, nays 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Participation in school sports. Requires, for purposes of interscholastic athletic events, school corporations, public schools, nonpublic schools, and certain athletic associations to expressly designate an athletic team or sport as one of the following: (1) A male, men's, or boys' team or sport. (2) A female, women's, or girls' team or sport. (3) A coeducational or mixed team or sport. Prohibits a male, based on the student's biological sex at birth in accordance with the student's genetics and reproductive biology, from participating on an athletic team or sport designated as being a female, women's, or girls' athletic team or sport. Requires school corporations, public schools, certain nonpublic schools, and certain athletic associations to: (1) establish and maintain grievance procedures; or (2) maintain grievance or protest procedures established before July 1, 2022; for a violation of these provisions. Establishes a civil action for a violation of these provisions. Provides that school corporations, public schools, certain nonpublic schools, and certain athletic associations are not subject to liability in a civil, administrative, disciplinary, or criminal action for acting in compliance with these provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Participation in school sports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-24 - House - House - Veto overridden by the House (Y: 67 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Veto overridden by the Senate (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 11 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 13 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-24SenateVeto overridden by the Senate; Roll Call 382: yeas 32, nays 15
2022-05-24HouseVeto overridden by the House; Roll Call 402: yeas 67, nays 28
2022-03-21HouseVetoed by the Governor
2022-03-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2022-03-07SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2022-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker
2022-03-02SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2022-03-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 278: yeas 32, nays 18
2022-02-28SenateSenator Young M added as cosponsor
2022-02-24SenateSenator Doriot added as cosponsor
2022-02-22SenateAmendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 225: yeas 16, nays 33
2022-02-22SenateAmendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 224: yeas 11, nays 37
2022-02-22SenateAmendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 223: yeas 13, nays 35
2022-02-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2022-02-21SenateSenator Byrne added as cosponsor
2022-02-17SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2022-02-14SenateSenator Kruse added as cosponsor
2022-02-14SenateSenator Sandlin added as third sponsor
2022-02-14SenateSenator Leising added as second sponsor
2022-02-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2022-01-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2022-01-27HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Donato
2022-01-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 135: yeas 66, nays 30
2022-01-26HouseAmendment #3 (DeLaney) motion withdrawn
2022-01-26HouseAmendment #1 (Davis) prevailed; voice vote
2022-01-26HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2022-01-24HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2022-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2022-01-04HouseCoauthored by Representatives Jeter, King, Heaton
2022-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Davis

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/bills/house/1041/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/3/1/603115db/HB1041.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/0/a/370aa0d7/HB1041.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/1/3/501306b9/HB1041.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/4/d/8c4d8ab1/HB1041.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/6/5/66650055/HB1041.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/0/4/a60445c2/HB1041.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/6/f/996f670b/HB1041.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/9/c/3b9c60d7/HB1041.05.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/e/d/37ed9468/HB1041.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/b/6/e0b6114d/HB1041.02.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/5/8/4658f1df/HB1041.02.COMH.AMH003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/1/4/21144693/HB1041.02.COMH.AMH004.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/2/f/682f0205/HB1041.04.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/b/7/4db78ade/HB1041.04.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/0/0/3f00e40e/HB1041.04.COMS.AMS003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/2/5/f125e694/HB1041.04.COMS.AMS004.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/1/b/121bbb12/HB1041.04.COMS.AMS005.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/d/c/eadcd14a/HB1041.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/6/f/db6f870c/HB1041.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/c/a/59caa9a2/HB1041.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/9/e/ee9ec163/HB1041.03.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/1/c/181c44fb/HB1041.03.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/d/e/0ade3c08/HB1041.03.ENGH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/6/4/8d642f7c/HB1041.04.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/b/e/84be9a84/HB1041.04.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/7/d/407db758/HB1041.04.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/e/2/88e2449f/HB1041.05.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/e/6/7ee6ff08/HB1041.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/f/b/c2fb3b0e/HB1041.135_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/7/8/4a78a827/HB1041.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/f/b/4ffb2a34/HB1041.223_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/e/0/60e06854/HB1041.224_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/a/3/2aa3f158/HB1041.225_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/7/f/727f964c/HB1041.278_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/a/8/0da89936/HB1041.382_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/3/d/cb3dea76/HB1041.402_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback