IN HB1041 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the adjutant general of the Indiana National Guard, specific active duty members, reserve duty members, or civilian employees of the Indiana National Guard designated by the adjutant general of the Indiana National Guard, to subscribe and administer oaths and take acknowledgments of all documents related to the service of an active or reserve duty member of the Indiana National Guard.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oaths and acknowledgment of documents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs - Roll Call 104102 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - House - House Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety - Roll Call 104101 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-26HousePublic Law 174
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-04SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2014-03-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 283: yeas 48 and nays 0
2014-02-27SenateSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Wyss added second sponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Arnold added as cosponsor.
2014-02-25SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-04SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs
2014-01-14HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 14: yeas 94 and nays 0
2014-01-14HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-01-14HouseRepresentative Klinker added as coauthor.
2014-01-14HouseSenator Paul added as sponsor.
2014-01-13HouseRepresentative Zent added as coauthor.
2014-01-13HouseSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-09HouseRepresentative Frye added as coauthor.
2014-01-09HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-01-07HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2014-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Gutwein

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1041/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/2/0/0b2022cc/HB1041.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/7/c/dd7cd7e5/HB1041.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/f/7/1ff7173d/HB1041.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/0/5/2505ab84/HB1041.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/6/c/e36c4380/HB1041.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/1/7/78173640/HB1041.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/a/0/a1a0bb71/HB1041.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/7/a/797a5723/HB1041.02.COMH.14.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/e/1/72e1537b/HB1041.02.COMH.14.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/1/2/fa12c99c/HB1041.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/c/5/6cc57ce8/HB1041.03.COMS.283.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback