IN HB1040 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Public Law 56
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sudden cardiac arrest of students. Provides that sudden cardiac arrest information sheets currently required to be provided by each school corporation, charter school, or state accredited nonpublic school to a parent of an applicable student must include: (1) the nature and warning signs of sudden cardiac arrest; and (2) information about electrocardiogram testing. Adds definition of "applicable student". Makes changes to the definition of "athletic activity". Provides that the department of education (department) must maintain guidelines, information sheets, or forms on the department's Internet web site. Provides that, if an applicable student is suspected, as determined by a game official, coach from the student athlete's team, certified athletic trainer, marching band leader, physician assistant, advanced practice registered nurse, licensed physician, or other official designated by the student athlete's school entity, of experiencing a symptom of sudden cardiac arrest in a practice for an athletic activity or in an athletic activity, the applicable student shall be removed from practice or play at the time that the symptom is identified. (Current law provides that, if a student athlete is suspected of experiencing a symptom of sudden cardiac arrest in a practice for an athletic activity or in an athletic activity, the student athlete shall be removed from practice or play at the time that the symptom is identified.) Allows a licensed athletic trainer, physician assistant, or advanced practice registered nurse to evaluate whether an applicable student is experiencing a symptom of sudden cardiac arrest. Requires that an applicable student may not return to practice or play until the coach, marching band leader, or other official designated by the applicable student's school entity has: (1) provided information to the applicable student's parent about sudden cardiac arrest; and (2) received verbal permission from a parent of the applicable student that the applicable student may return to practice and play. Requires a coach, marching band leader, or certain other leaders, in a manner and frequency determined by the state board of education, to complete the sudden cardiac arrest training course offered by a provider approved by the department. Provides that a coach, marching band leader, and certain other extracurricular activity leader who completes the course and provides coaching or other leadership services in good faith is not personally liable for damages in a civil action as a result of a sudden cardiac arrest incurred by an applicable student participating in an athletic activity for which the coach, marching band leader, or other leader provided coaching or leadership services, except for an act or omission by the coach, marching band leader, or other extracurricular activity leader that constitutes gross negligence or willful or wanton misconduct. Makes technical corrections (a legal guardian is included in the definition of a parent in IC 20).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sudden cardiac arrest of students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HousePublic Law 56
2021-04-15HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-08SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-07HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-01HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 343: yeas 88, nays 0
2021-03-31HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-03-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-03-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 271: yeas 37, nays 13
2021-03-18SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-03-16SenateSenator Qaddoura added as cosponsor
2021-03-15SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-08SenateSenator Kruse added as second sponsor
2021-02-24SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-17HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Bohacek
2021-02-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 176: yeas 92, nays 6
2021-02-16HouseAmendment #2 (Pressel) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-16HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2021-01-04HouseCoauthored by Representatives Hatfield and Cook
2021-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Pressel

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1040/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/6/8/d468a346/HB1040.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/a/8/b3a8e8cb/HB1040.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/5/5/f55527d4/HB1040.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/6/9/84698b90/HB1040.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/a/8/dda85c6e/HB1040.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/a/9/32a9d787/HB1040.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/e/f/28ef40ca/HB1040.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/f/0/30f071c7/HB1040.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/4/2/d54261a8/HB1040.05.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/2/5/57257192/HB1040.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/0/a/120ac8e3/HB1040.02.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/2/0/652096c1/HB1040.02.COMH.AMH003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/8/0/26802c3b/HB1040.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/a/1/7fa16a17/HB1040.01.INTR.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/3/e/653ed388/HB1040.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/a/2/e3a235c2/HB1040.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/a/c/f4aced73/HB1040.03.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/3/7/3a377432/HB1040.03.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/b/1/07b11e23/HB1040.03.ENGH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/a/a/dbaad2a9/HB1040.04.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/5/3/6f5357c1/HB1040.04.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/9/3/54939a1a/HB1040.04.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/3/4/7c344a60/HB1040.04.COMS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/d/9/38d9df05/HB1040.05.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/1/e/051e0331/HB1040.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/d/9/9bd9e3a3/HB1040.176_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/c/5/41c57a7f/HB1040.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/1/5/62158593/HB1040.271_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/1/5/f215851f/HB1040.343_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback