IN HB1039 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-22 - Referred to committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-22 - Referred to committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Court staff attorney pilot program. Creates the circuit and superior court staff attorney pilot program (pilot program) to provide assistance to courts with preparing orders for complex motions. Requires the judicial center to administer the pilot program and to report to the interim study committee on courts and the judiciary (committee) concerning the pilot program. Requires the committee to receive reports concerning the pilot program, and allows the committee to make recommendations and to propose legislation concerning the pilot program.
Title
Court staff attorney pilot program. Creates the circuit and superior court staff attorney pilot program (pilot program) to provide assistance to courts with preparing orders for complex motions. Requires the judicial center to administer the pilot program and to report to the interim study committee on courts and the judiciary (committee) concerning the pilot program. Requires the committee to receive reports concerning the pilot program, and allows the committee to make recommendations and to propose legislation concerning the pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-21 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | House | Representative DeLaney added as coauthor |
2015-01-06 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2015-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Washburne |