IN HB1038 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 213
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 213
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Blood donation testing.
Title
Blood donation testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 213 |
2013-05-09 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 553: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 611: yeas 87, nays 0 |
2013-04-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate advisor appointed: Grooms and Stoops |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Pat Miller and Breaux |
2013-04-15 | House | House advisors appointed: T. Brown and C. Brown |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Clere and Harris |
2013-04-15 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 356: yeas 48 and nays 1 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Pat Miller), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2013-01-31 | House | Representative Harris added as coauthor |
2013-01-31 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Pat Miller |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 48: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2013-01-29 | House | Amendment 1 (Clere), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-01-29 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-17 | House | Representative C. Brown added as coauthor |
2013-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2013-01-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative Clere |
2013-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative T. Brown |