IN HB1037 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Indiana department of transportation to adopt rules concerning minimum distance requirements at railroad crossings. Provides that statutory minimum distance requirements expire on the date on which the rules are finally adopted. Provides that a railroad that violates a rule adopted by the Indiana department of transportation (INDOT) concerning minimum distance requirements at railroad crossings is subject to a civil penalty of $100 for each day the violation continues and that the maximum civil penalty for a continuing violation is $5,000. Authorizes INDOT to bring an action to recover a civil penalty in the circuit or superior court of the county in which the crossing that is the subject of the violation is located.
Title
Railroad crossings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 2 |
2013-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-03-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 254: yeas 44 and nays 0 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2013-01-23 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Arnold |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-01-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 19: yeas 91, nays 1 |
2013-01-22 | House | Representatives DeLaney, Smaltz and Niemeyer added as coauthors |
2013-01-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2013-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday |