IN HB1036 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Public Law 94
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Public Law 94
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Statutory authorization to construct interstates. Removes requirement that the general assembly enact a statute authorizing the construction of I-69 in Perry Township (Marion County) before I-69 may be constructed in Perry Township.
Title
Statutory authorization to construct interstates. Removes requirement that the general assembly enact a statute authorizing the construction of I-69 in Perry Township (Marion County) before I-69 may be constructed in Perry Township.
Sponsors
Rep. John Price [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Rep. Charles Burton [R] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] |
Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | Public Law 94 |
2015-04-30 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 415: yeas 31, nays 19 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Homeland Security & Transportation |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Steele added as third sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Walker added as second sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Bray added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 233: yeas 83, nays 11 |
2015-02-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-27 | House | Representatives Koch, Burton, DeLaney added as coauthorss |
2015-01-06 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2015-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Price |