IN HB1035 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Public Law 73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Public Law 73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Short term rentals. Provides the following with regard to short term rentals that are rented through a short term rental platform: (1) Provides that a short term rental of an owner's primary residence is a permitted residential use under any applicable ordinance and may not be disallowed. (2) Provides that, in the case of residential property that is not the person's primary residence, a local unit of government (local unit): (A) may require a special exception, special use, or zoning variance for the short term rental of the property; and (B) may not interpret and enforce zoning regulations for a
Title
Short term rentals. Provides the following with regard to short term rentals that are rented through a short term rental platform: (1) Provides that a short term rental of an owner's primary residence is a permitted residential use under any applicable ordinance and may not be disallowed. (2) Provides that, in the case of residential property that is not the person's primary residence, a local unit of government (local unit): (A) may require a special exception, special use, or zoning variance for the short term rental of the property; and (B) may not interpret and enforce zoning regulations for a
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. David Ober [R] | Rep. Karlee Macer [D] |
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Public Law 73 |
2018-03-14 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 325: yeas 73, nays 19 |
2018-03-05 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 245: yeas 47, nays 2 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-22 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Messmer and Tallian |
2018-01-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 25: yeas 74, nays 19 |
2018-01-18 | House | Representatives McNamara, Ober, Macer added as coauthors |
2018-01-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2018-01-03 | House | Authored by Representative Lehman |