IN HB1034 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Senate advisors appointed: Houchin, Niezgodski and Spartz
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Political subdivision controlled projects and debt. Amends the definition of a "controlled project" to exclude projects for: (1) roads; (2) streets; (3) bridges; and (4) road, street, or bridge appurtenances. Provides that, for purposes of the petition and remonstrance process, a controlled project includes any project: (1) that is not otherwise a controlled project; but (2) the cost of which, when added to the cost of all other projects adopted by the political subdivision in the preceding five years, exceeds 1% of the political subdivision's gross assessed value but does not exceed 2% of the political subdivision's gross assessed value. Provides that, for purposes of the referendum process, a controlled project includes any project: (1) that is not otherwise a controlled project; but (2) the cost of which, when added to the cost of all other projects adopted by the political subdivision in the preceding five years, exceeds 2% of the political subdivision's gross assessed value. Provides that the notice of the preliminary determination of the political subdivision to issue bonds or enter into a lease for a controlled project must include a statement that a person may file a petition with the department of local government finance objecting that the political subdivision has unlawfully divided a controlled project in order to avoid the petition and remonstrance or referendum requirements. Provides that if the estimated increase in a political subdivision's property tax levy for debt service for a proposed controlled project will be offset in whole or in part because of the retirement of existing debt of the political subdivision, the proper officers of the political subdivision may adopt a resolution that includes certain information and statements. Provides that if a political subdivision experiences a decrease in net assessed value it may be stated as an exception to a political subdivision's statement about maintaining its property tax rate to fund a new controlled project because of the retirement of debt. Specifies the ballot language for the referendum on such a proposed controlled project. Provides that the restrictions on supporting a position on a controlled project apply to any political subdivision that has assessed value within the same taxing district as the political subdivision proposing the project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political subdivision controlled projects and debt. Amends the definition of a "controlled project" to exclude projects for: (1) roads; (2) streets; (3) bridges; and (4) road, street, or bridge appurtenances. Provides that, for purposes of the petition and remonstrance process, a controlled project includes any project: (1) that is not otherwise a controlled project; but (2) the cost of which, when added to the cost of all other projects adopted by the political subdivision in the preceding five years, exceeds 1% of the political subdivision's gross assessed value but does not exceed 2% of the political subdivision's gross assessed value. Provides that, for purposes of the referendum process, a controlled project includes any project: (1) that is not otherwise a controlled project; but (2) the cost of which, when added to the cost of all other projects adopted by the political subdivision in the preceding five years, exceeds 2% of the political subdivision's gross assessed value. Provides that the notice of the preliminary determination of the political subdivision to issue bonds or enter into a lease for a controlled project must include a statement that a person may file a petition with the department of local government finance objecting that the political subdivision has unlawfully divided a controlled project in order to avoid the petition and remonstrance or referendum requirements. Provides that if the estimated increase in a political subdivision's property tax levy for debt service for a proposed controlled project will be offset in whole or in part because of the retirement of existing debt of the political subdivision, the proper officers of the political subdivision may adopt a resolution that includes certain information and statements. Provides that if a political subdivision experiences a decrease in net assessed value it may be stated as an exception to a political subdivision's statement about maintaining its property tax rate to fund a new controlled project because of the retirement of debt. Specifies the ballot language for the referendum on such a proposed controlled project. Provides that the restrictions on supporting a position on a controlled project apply to any political subdivision that has assessed value within the same taxing district as the political subdivision proposing the project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateSenate advisors appointed: Houchin, Niezgodski and Spartz
2019-04-18SenateSenate conferees appointed: Holdman and Taylor G
2019-04-18HouseHouse advisors appointed: Negele, Ziemke, Harris and Wright
2019-04-18HouseHouse conferees appointed: Thompson and Pryor
2019-04-18HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-18HouseRepresentative Goodrich added as coauthor
2019-04-17HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-16SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 474: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-09SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-04-01SenateSenator Houchin added as cosponsor
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2019-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-28HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Holdman and Taylor G
2019-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 47: yeas 96, nays 1
2019-01-24HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-22HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-07HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor
2019-01-03HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-03HouseAuthored by Representative Thompson

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback