IN HB1034 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Home detention matters. Eliminates the requirement that a period of home detention ordered as a condition of probation must be at least 60 days. Allows a court to approve activities for an offender that do not require the offender to be confined to the offender's home at all times. Provides that an offender must maintain a working telephone, cellular telephone, or other wireless or cellular communications device in the offender's home as a condition of being on home detention.
Title
Home detention matters. Eliminates the requirement that a period of home detention ordered as a condition of probation must be at least 60 days. Allows a court to approve activities for an offender that do not require the offender to be confined to the offender's home at all times. Provides that an offender must maintain a working telephone, cellular telephone, or other wireless or cellular communications device in the offender's home as a condition of being on home detention.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Public Law 21 |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 207: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-18 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Glick |
2018-01-18 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 12: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | Representatives McNamara and Hatfield added as coauthors |
2018-01-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-11 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2018-01-03 | House | Authored by Representative Lehman |