IN HB1034 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Physical therapy services without a referral.
Title
Physical therapy services without a referral.
Sponsors
Rep. David Frizzell [R] | Rep. Matthew Ubelhor [R] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] | Rep. Robert Morris [R] |
Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 98 |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 515: yeas 80, nays 12 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 280: yeas 45 and nays 4 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Pat Miller), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senator M. Young added as cosponsor |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2013-02-12 | House | Representatives C. Brown and Shackleford added as coauthors |
2013-02-12 | House | House Rule 105.1 suspended |
2013-02-12 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Pat Miller and Becker |
2013-02-12 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-12 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 107: yeas 80, nays 18 |
2013-02-11 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-14 | House | Representatives Ubelhor, T. Brown and Morris added as coauthors |
2013-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2013-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Frizzell |