IN HB1033 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Treatment of out-of-state convictions in sentencing. Provides that, for purposes of law regarding death sentences and sentences for felonies and habitual offenders, a Level 6 felony conviction includes a conviction in another jurisdiction for which the offender might have been imprisoned for more than one year but less than two and one-half years.
Title
Treatment of out-of-state convictions in sentencing. Provides that, for purposes of law regarding death sentences and sentences for felonies and habitual offenders, a Level 6 felony conviction includes a conviction in another jurisdiction for which the offender might have been imprisoned for more than one year but less than two and one-half years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Public Law 20 |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as cosponsor |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 206: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-22 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Koch |
2018-01-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 24: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2018-01-18 | House | Amendment #1 (Washburne) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-18 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-16 | House | Representative Dvorak added as coauthor |
2018-01-11 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2018-01-03 | House | Authored by Representative Washburne |