IN HB1032 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Returned to the House with amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Newborn safety devices. Provides for placement of a newborn safety device at any facility that is staffed by an emergency medical services provider on a 24 hour per day, seven day per week basis, provided the newborn safety device: (1) is located in an area that is conspicuous and visible to staff; and (2) includes a dual alarm system that is connected to the facility and is tested at least one time per month to ensure the alarm system is in working order. Provides for placement of a newborn safety device at any fire department, including a volunteer fire department that: (1) meets the minimum response time established by the county, not to exceed four minutes; (2) is located within one mile of a hospital, police station, or emergency medical services station that meets certain requirements; (3) is equipped with an alert system that, when the newborn safety device is opened, automatically connects to the 911 system and transmits a request for immediate dispatch of an emergency medical services provider to the location of the newborn safety device and is tested at least one time per month to ensure the alert system is in working order; and (4) is equipped with an independent video surveillance system that allows at least two members of a fire department to monitor inside the newborn safety device at all times. Provides that a person who in good faith voluntarily leaves a child in a newborn safety device located at such a facility or fire station is not obligated to disclose the parent's name or the person's name. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Newborn safety devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-04-06SenateSenator Yoder added as cosponsor
2021-04-06SenateSenators Rogers, Koch, Kruse, Sandlin, Holdman added as cosponsors
2021-04-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 350: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-04-05SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-04-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-18SenateSenator Walker G added as cosponsor
2021-03-18SenateSenator Crane added as third sponsor
2021-03-18SenateSenator Ford Jon added as second sponsor
2021-02-18SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
2021-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-02HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Houchin
2021-02-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 34: yeas 95, nays 0
2021-02-01HouseRepresentatives Gutwein, Olthoff, Andrade M added as coauthors
2021-02-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2021-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Frye R

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1032/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/6/a/136a3325/HB1032.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/5/3/99530d48/HB1032.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/3/c/f53c0bc0/HB1032.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/e/f/42ef88bc/HB1032.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/f/4/dcf4dba3/HB1032.03.COMS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/e/6/1ce639a0/HB1032.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/6/0/6b60b6d7/HB1032.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/7/4/b97412b9/HB1032.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/4/1/26419147/HB1032.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/6/a/616a324a/HB1032.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/6/d/326df612/HB1032.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/0/2/4002c5c5/HB1032.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/7/3/02738599/HB1032.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/1/4/1414b1fa/HB1032.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/3/4/25346336/HB1032.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/e/4/76e4252b/HB1032.34_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/6/a/7c6aaec6/HB1032.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/1/e/f61e9c64/HB1032.350_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback