IN HB1032 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - First Reading: Referred to Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a redistricting commission (commission) to create, hold hearings on, take public comment about, and recommend plans to redraw general assembly districts and congressional districts. Requires the legislative services agency (agency) to provide staff and administrative services to the commission. Establishes standards to govern the commission and the agency in the creation of redistricting plans. Provides that if the Constitution of the State of Indiana does not require the general assembly to establish legislative districts, the commission's recommendations for legislative and congressional districts become the plans that define those districts. Provides that, if the Constitution so requires, the general assembly must meet and enact redistricting plans before October 1 of a redistricting year. Authorizes the general assembly to convene in a session to act on redistricting bills at times other than the times the general assembly is currently authorized to meet. Repeals the current law establishing a redistricting commission for congressional redistricting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Redistricting commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-01-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House Floor - (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House Floor - (Y: 30 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-01-13 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 30 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-01-08 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Roll Call 103201 (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-04SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Elections
2014-01-28HouseRepresentative Forestal added as coauthor.
2014-01-23HouseRepresentative Hamm added as coauthor.
2014-01-21HouseSenator Lanane added as 2nd sponsor.
2014-01-21HouseSenator Delph added as sponsor.
2014-01-21HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-01-21HouseRepresentative Culver added as coauthor.
2014-01-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 32: yeas 77 and nays 20
2014-01-15HouseRepresentative Bosma added as coauthor.
2014-01-15HouseRepresentative M. Smith added as coauthor.
2014-01-15HouseRepresentative Goodin added as coauthor.
2014-01-15HouseRepresentative Moed added as coauthor.
2014-01-13HouseAmendment #8 (GiaQuinta), prevailed.
2014-01-13HouseAmendment #9 (GiaQuinta), prevailed.
2014-01-13HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-01-13HouseAmendment #1 (Battles), prevailed; Roll Call 12: yeas 75 and nays 19
2014-01-13HouseAmendment #5 (Moed), failed; Roll Call 11: yeas 30 and nays 62
2014-01-13HouseAmendment #10 (GiaQuinta), prevailed.
2014-01-09HouseCommittee report: do pass amend, adopted.
2014-01-07HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Elections and Apportionment
2014-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Torr

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1032/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/a/8/04a8b9d0/HB1032.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/6/f/206f2c96/HB1032.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/0/a/e60ae5bf/HB1032.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/8/2/ff82d596/HB1032.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/1/5/0215960d/HB1032.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/4/3/9343f630/HB1032.03.ENGH.32.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/8/b/c58b2674/HB1032.02.COMH.11.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/5/f/285f3ccc/HB1032.02.COMH.12.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/1/e/9a1ef58b/HB1032.02.COMH.11.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/3/2/283245b8/HB1032.02.COMH.12.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback