IN HB1030 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
Pending: Senate Commerce & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Safety requirements for Class 2 structures. Provides that for purposes of the building code, a Class 2 structure townhouse may be separated from an adjoining unit by a one hour fire-resistance rated wall, if each adjoining unit contains an automatic sprinkler system. Prohibits the fire prevention and building safety commission or a state agency from adopting rules requiring the installation of an automatic fire sprinkler system. Prohibits a political subdivision from adopting an ordinance or other regulation requiring the installation of an automatic fire sprinkler system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safety requirements for Class 2 structures. Provides that for purposes of the building code, a Class 2 structure townhouse may be separated from an adjoining unit by a one hour fire-resistance rated wall, if each adjoining unit contains an automatic sprinkler system. Prohibits the fire prevention and building safety commission or a state agency from adopting rules requiring the installation of an automatic fire sprinkler system. Prohibits a political subdivision from adopting an ordinance or other regulation requiring the installation of an automatic fire sprinkler system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2018-01-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2018-01-23HouseRepresentative Moseley removed as coauthor
2018-01-23HouseRepresentative Miller added as coauthor
2018-01-23HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Messmer, Crider and Perfect
2018-01-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 44: yeas 68, nays 28
2018-01-22HouseAmendment #1 (Miller D) prevailed; voice vote
2018-01-22HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2018-01-18HouseRepresentatives Bartels and Moseley added as coauthors
2018-01-16HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2018-01-03HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2018-01-03HouseAuthored by Representative Frye R

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback