IN HB1029 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 97
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Adoption history information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption history information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 508 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 97
2013-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-17HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-16HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 508: yeas 92, nays 0
2013-04-10SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2013-04-10SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 418: yeas 50 and nays 0
2013-04-09SenateAmendment 1 (Holdman), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-09SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-04-04SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2013-04-04SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-02-25SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2013-02-04HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Glick
2013-02-04HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-02-04HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 54: yeas 95, nays 0
2013-01-31HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-01-29HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-28HouseRepresentative Klinker added as coauthor
2013-01-14HouseRepresentative Karickhoff added as coauthor
2013-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2013-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Negele

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback