IN HB1028 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - First Reading: Referred to committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

School expenses. Removes the expiration date in current law on the authority of a school corporation to use money in its capital projects fund to pay the costs of insurance and utilities. Provides that a school corporation may use money in its capital projects fund or its rainy day fund to pay for an audit of the school corporation by the state board of accounts or a private accounting firm certified by the state board of accounts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School expenses. Removes the expiration date in current law on the authority of a school corporation to use money in its capital projects fund to pay the costs of insurance and utilities. Provides that a school corporation may use money in its capital projects fund or its rainy day fund to pay for an audit of the school corporation by the state board of accounts or a private accounting firm certified by the state board of accounts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 28 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-09 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2015-02-17HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-16HouseSenator Mishler added as sponsor
2015-02-16HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 132: yeas 96, nays 0
2015-02-12HouseAmendment #2 (Porter) ruled out of order voice vote
2015-02-12HouseAmendment #1 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 128: yeas 28, nays 69
2015-02-12HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-10HouseRepresentative Ober added as coauthor
2015-02-10HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-29HouseRepresentative Cook added as coauthor
2015-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative McNamara
2015-01-06HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback