IN HB1028 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the maximum amount of a deceased state police officer's supplementary death benefit from $14,500 to $20,000 for state police officers who die after June 30, 2013.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State police death benefit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 61
2013-04-15HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-04-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-03-28SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2013-03-26SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2013-03-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 312: yeas 47 and nays 0
2013-03-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-21SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-02-25SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2013-01-22HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Arnold and Wyss
2013-01-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-01-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 12: yeas 96, nays 0
2013-01-17HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-01-17HouseRepresentative Morris added as coauthor
2013-01-15HouseRepresentative Macer added as coauthor
2013-01-15HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2013-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Neese

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback