IN HB1027 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 96
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Civil immunity for services in emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil immunity for services in emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 96
2013-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-17HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-16HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 520: yeas 91, nays 0
2013-03-25SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2013-03-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 303: yeas 46 and nays 0
2013-03-21SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-19SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-25SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
2013-02-11HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Merritt and Lanane
2013-02-11HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-02-11HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 91: yeas 93, nays 0
2013-02-07HouseAmendment 1 (Messmer), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-07HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-02-05HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2013-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Messmer

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback