IN HB1025 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
BMV and driver license compact. Provides that the bureau of motor vehicles may issue a person a driver's license if a party state to the driver license compact reports that the driver's license of the person is suspended and the bureau determines that the: (1) party state's report is erroneous; and (2) person's driver's license is not suspended by the party state or the suspension is terminated; under certain circumstances.
Title
BMV and driver license compact. Provides that the bureau of motor vehicles may issue a person a driver's license if a party state to the driver license compact reports that the driver's license of the person is suspended and the bureau determines that the: (1) party state's report is erroneous; and (2) person's driver's license is not suspended by the party state or the suspension is terminated; under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. Randall Frye [R] | Rep. Cherrish Pryor [D] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] |
Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Public Law 14 |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as second sponsor |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 284: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Homeland Security & Transportation |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-01-27 | House | Representative Koch added as coauthor |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Steele added first sponsor |
2015-01-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 27: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2015-01-26 | House | Representative Pryor added as coauthor |
2015-01-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-06 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2015-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Frye R |