IN HB1025 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-25 - Representative Harris added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the northwest Indiana transportation study commission (commission). Requires the commission to: (1) monitor the development of commuter transportation and rail service in the Lowell-Chicago and Valparaiso- Chicago corridors; (2) study all aspects of regional mass transportation and road and highway needs in northwest Indiana; (3) study northwest Indiana transportation, infrastructure, and economic development issues; and (4) study other topics as assigned by the legislative council. Provides that the commission consists of 14 voting members: six senators from northwest Indiana; six members of the house of representatives from northwest Indiana; one nonlegislator appointed by the northwestern Indiana regional planning commission; and one nonlegislator appointed by the Michiana Area Council of Governments. Provides that the commission does not expire. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the northwest Indiana transportation study commission.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Northwest Indiana transportation study commission.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-25 Representative Harris added as coauthor
2010-01-25 Amendment 2 (Walorski), failed; Voice Vote
2010-01-25 Reread second time: ordered engrossed
2010-01-21 Placed back on second reading
2010-01-20 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-14 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2010-01-05 Authored by Representative Niezgodski

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback