IN HB1023 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Annexation remonstrance waivers. Permits a municipal works board to waive the requirement in a sewage works contract that a property owner releases the property owner's right to remonstrate against pending or future annexations by the municipality of the area served by the sewage works.
Title
Annexation remonstrance waivers. Permits a municipal works board to waive the requirement in a sewage works contract that a property owner releases the property owner's right to remonstrate against pending or future annexations by the municipality of the area served by the sewage works.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] | Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. Scott Pelath [D] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] |
Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Public Law 18 |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 243: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-30 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Messmer |
2018-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 76: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2018-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-25 | House | Representative Pelath added as coauthor |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | House | Representative Zent added as coauthor |
2018-01-03 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-01-03 | House | Authored by Representative Bacon |