IN HB1020 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Representatives Porter and Pryor added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Hate crimes. Makes it an aggravating circumstance (for purposes of imposing a criminal sentence) that the crime was committed with the intent to harm or intimidate an individual or a group of individuals because of certain perceived or actual characteristics of the individual or group of individuals. Requires law enforcement agencies to report hate crimes to the Federal Bureau of Investigation. Requires the law enforcement training board to adopt, not later than January 1, 2020, minimum standards for training of law enforcement officers regarding: (1) identifying hate crimes; (2) responding to hate crimes; and (3) reporting hate crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hate crimes. Makes it an aggravating circumstance (for purposes of imposing a criminal sentence) that the crime was committed with the intent to harm or intimidate an individual or a group of individuals because of certain perceived or actual characteristics of the individual or group of individuals. Requires law enforcement agencies to report hate crimes to the Federal Bureau of Investigation. Requires the law enforcement training board to adopt, not later than January 1, 2020, minimum standards for training of law enforcement officers regarding: (1) identifying hate crimes; (2) responding to hate crimes; and (3) reporting hate crimes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-29HouseRepresentatives Porter and Pryor added as coauthors
2019-01-29HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2019-01-14HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as coauthor
2019-01-03HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2019-01-03HouseCoauthored by Representatives Schaibley and Ziemke
2019-01-03HouseAuthored by Representative Cook

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback