IN HB1019 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Renames the Lewis and Clark bicentennial commission as the Lewis and Clark expedition commission (commission). Reduces the number of legislative members on the commission to two members of the house of representatives and two members of the senate (current law provides for six members from the house of representatives and six members from the senate). Renames the Lewis and Clark bicentennial license plate as the Lewis and Clark expedition license plate. Removes requirement that the department of natural resources staff the commission. Requires notice of a commission meeting to be given to members of the commission at least a ten (10) days before the meeting date. Requires an approval vote of the members of the commission before money acquired by the commission is disbursed. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lewis and Clark expedition commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-04 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Roll Call 101903 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Natural Resources - Roll Call 101901 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-27HousePublic Law 203
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-13SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-04HouseMotion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed, Roll Call 385: yeas 90 and nays 0
2014-02-24SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2014-02-24SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 217: yeas 47 and nays 0
2014-02-24SenateSenator Alting added third sponsor.
2014-02-24SenateSenator Tomes added second sponsor.
2014-02-20SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-02-20SenateHB 1019 Amendment #1 (Smith), prevailed.
2014-02-18SenateSenator R. Young added as cosponsor.
2014-02-17SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-10SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources
2014-02-03HouseSenator Grooms added as sponsor.
2014-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-02-03HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 168: yeas 94 and nays 0
2014-01-30HouseHB 1019 Amendment #2 (Clere), prevailed.
2014-01-30HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-01-28HouseCommittee report: do pass amend, adopted.
2014-01-23HouseRepresentative Stemler added as coauthor.
2014-01-23HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor.
2014-01-07HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Natural Resources
2014-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Saunders

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1019/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/f/8/9ef815eb/HB1019.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/5/a/c15a407a/HB1019.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/b/c/2cbcb2cb/HB1019.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/c/f/27cf39b6/HB1019.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/8/9/cc898c3d/HB1019.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/a/6/baa63b3e/HB1019.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/b/a/41ba4e7c/HB1019.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/f/c/d6fca5be/HB1019.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/4/d/c14d8c1e/HB1019.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/9/4/a394741d/HB1019.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/8/2/b982f08f/HB1019.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/4/b/e44b8b9b/HB1019.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/1/9/fc1975da/HB1019.03.ENGH.168.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/9/2/a792f418/HB1019.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/1/8/d1189ce3/HB1019.05.ENGS.217.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/4/4/be4493d2/HB1019.05.ENGS.385.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback