IN HB1018 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-03 - Representative Pryor added as coauthor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-03 - Representative Pryor added as coauthor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tax increment financing. Provides that if a redevelopment commission adopts a declaratory resolution or amendment after June 30, 2015, that establishes, renews, or expands an allocation provision or area, the base assessed value used to determine the amount of allocated tax proceeds for the redevelopment district must be increased each year so that the incremental assessed value is 50% of the incremental assessed value in the allocation area without the increase. Provides that for the allocation area in Marion County that is identified as the Consolidated Allocation Area, the expiration date for the allocation area is June 30, 2026, or
Title
Tax increment financing. Provides that if a redevelopment commission adopts a declaratory resolution or amendment after June 30, 2015, that establishes, renews, or expands an allocation provision or area, the base assessed value used to determine the amount of allocated tax proceeds for the redevelopment district must be increased each year so that the incremental assessed value is 50% of the incremental assessed value in the allocation area without the increase. Provides that for the allocation area in Marion County that is identified as the Consolidated Allocation Area, the expiration date for the allocation area is June 30, 2026, or
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-03 | House | Representative Pryor added as coauthor |
2015-01-06 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Cherry |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1018/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/8/8/98886f4f/HB1018.01.INTR.pdf |