IN HB1018 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires mine electricians who perform electrical work in certain coal mines to: (1) be tested by; and (2) receive a certificate of competency from; the mining board. Allows certain individuals certified by the mine safety and health administration or another state to serve as a mine electrician if the individual obtains an Indiana miner's certificate of competency from the director of mines and mine safety. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Mine electrician certification.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] | Rep. Kreg Battles [D] | Rep. Sue Ellspermann [R] | Rep. Robert Heaton [R] |
Rep. Matthew Ubelhor [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-02-20 | Senator Buck added as third sponsor | |
2012-02-20 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2012-02-20 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 205: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-02-16 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-14 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-26 | Senate sponsors: Senators Steele and Hume | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-26 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 64: yeas 97, nays 0 | |
2012-01-25 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | Representative Battles added as coauthor | |
2012-01-17 | Representative Bacon added as coauthor | |
2012-01-13 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources | |
2012-01-09 | Coauthored by Representatives Heaton and Ellspermann | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Ubelhor |