IN HB1017 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 63-9)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Newborn screening. Adds spinal muscular atrophy and severe combined immunodeficiency to the list of disorders in the newborn screening requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Newborn screening. Adds spinal muscular atrophy and severe combined immunodeficiency to the list of disorders in the newborn screening requirements.

Sponsors

Rep. Doug Gutwein [R]Rep. Donna Schaibley [R]Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R]Rep. Gregory Porter [D]
Rep. Brian Bosma [R]Rep. Ronald Bacon [R]Rep. James Baird [R]Rep. Steve Bartels [R]
Rep. Greg Beumer [R]Rep. Bruce Borders [R]Rep. Charles Burton [R]Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R]
Rep. Robert Cherry [R]Rep. Edward Clere [R]Rep. Anthony Cook [R]Rep. Wes Culver [R]
Rep. Steven Davisson [R]Rep. Dale DeVon [R]Rep. Sean Eberhart [R]Rep. Karen Engleman [R]
Rep. William Friend [R]Rep. David Frizzell [R]Rep. Randall Frye [R]Rep. Richard Hamm [R]
Rep. Robert Heaton [R]Rep. Dave Heine [R]Rep. Todd Huston [R]Rep. Christopher Judy [R]
Rep. Donald Lehe [R]Rep. Matthew Lehman [R]Rep. Daniel Leonard [R]Rep. Shane Lindauer [R]
Rep. Randy Lyness [R]Rep. Kevin Mahan [R]Rep. Chris May [R]Rep. Wendy McNamara [R]
Rep. Doug Miller [R]Rep. Robert Morris [R]Rep. Sharon Negele [R]Rep. David Ober [R]
Rep. Julie Olthoff [R]Rep. Jim Pressel [R]Rep. Kathy Richardson [R]Rep. Thomas Saunders [R]
Rep. Sally Siegrist [R]Rep. Harold Slager [R]Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R]Rep. Milo Smith [R]
Rep. Edmond Soliday [R]Rep. Mike Speedy [R]Rep. Holli Sullivan [R]Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R]
Rep. Gerald Torr [R]Rep. Heath VanNatter [R]Rep. Thomas Washburne [R]Rep. Timothy Wesco [R]
Rep. David Wolkins [R]Rep. Dennis Zent [R]Rep. Cindy Ziemke [R]Rep. Jack Jordan [R]
Rep. Peggy Mayfield [R]Rep. John Bartlett [D]Rep. Patrick Bauer [D]Rep. Charlie Brown [D]
Rep. Carey Hamilton [D]Rep. Sheila Klinker [D]Rep. Linda Lawson [D]Rep. Cherrish Pryor [D]
Rep. Vernon Smith [D]Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R]Sen. Randall Head [R]Sen. Vaneta Becker [R]

Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-13SenateSenator Becker added as cosponsor
2018-02-01SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2018-01-30HouseReferred to the Senate
2018-01-30HouseRepresentatives Bartlett, Bauer, Brown, C., Hamilton, Klinker, Lawson, Pryor, Smith, V. added as coauthors
2018-01-30HouseRepresentatives Jordan and Mayfield added as coauthors
2018-01-30HouseRepresentatives Bacon, Baird, Bartels, Beumer, Borders, Burton, Carbaugh, Cherry, Clere, Cook, Culver, Davisson, DeVon, Eberhart, Engleman, Friend, Frizzell, Frye, Hamm, Heaton, Heine, Huston, Judy, Lehe, Lehman, Leonard, Lindauer, Lyness , Mahan, May, McNamara, Miller, Morris, Negele, Ober, Olthoff, Pressel, Richardson, Saunders, Siegrist, Slager, Steuerwald, Smith, M., Soliday, Speedy, Sullivan, Thompson, Torr, VanNatter, Washburne, Wesco, Wolkins, Zent, Ziemke added as coauthors
2018-01-30HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2018-01-29HouseRepresentative Bosma added as coauthor
2018-01-29HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2018-01-29HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Head
2018-01-29HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 60: yeas 96, nays 0
2018-01-25HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2018-01-22HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2018-01-18HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2018-01-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-01-08HouseRepresentatives Schaibley, Karickhoff, Porter added as coauthors
2018-01-03HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2018-01-03HouseAuthored by Representative Gutwein

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2018/bills/house/1017/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/3/a/943a4045/HB1017.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/1/9/23194b8d/HB1017.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/5/a/c95a98e6/HB1017.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/b/6/43b6b143/HB1017.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/f/0/7bf06eda/HB1017.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/8/4/69847ca7/HB1017.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/4/9/23494379/HB1017.04.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/8/0/a5803685/HB1017.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/2/f/942f074a/HB1017.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/e/5/a7e5c832/HB1017.60.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/e/e/20eee793/HB1017.03.COMH.00.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback